Posted in Մաթեմատիկա

Տնային Աշխատանք

15.10.2015թ.

Պարապունք 25

Տնային Աշխատանք

326 և 327

326.

193×40+139×60=193x(40+60)=19.300

18×5+18×95=18x(5+95)=1800

973×37+27×37=37x(937+27)=37.600

130×78+70+78=78x(130+70)=15.600

388×99+12×99=99x(388+12)=39.600

657×33+657×67=657x(33+67)=65.700

328.

38×275+38×25=38x(275+25)=11.400

103×87+103×29=103x(87+29)=11.948

66×432+66×97=66x(432+97)=34.914

73×205+73×56=73x(205+56)=19.053

Advertisements

Leave a Reply

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out / Change )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out / Change )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out / Change )

Google+ photo

You are commenting using your Google+ account. Log Out / Change )

Connecting to %s